CA AB1774 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 654.1, 655.5, 1206, 1206.6, 1220, 1244, 1246.5, 1271.1, 1272, 1300, 1301, and 1320 of, to add Section 1272.1 to, to repeal Sections 1241.1, 1265, 1265.1, 1266, 1267, 1268, 1272.4, 1272.6, 1281, 1300.1, 1324, and 1325 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1223, 1227, and 1310 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 9272 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 1206 and 1600.3 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14043.27 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to clinical laboratories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinical laboratories: licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2016-05-27AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2016-05-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2016-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19).
2016-02-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2016-02-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
2016-02-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1206Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1206.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1220Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1223Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1227Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1241.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1244Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1246.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1265Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1265.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1266Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1267Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1268Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1271.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1272Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1272.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1272.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1272.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1281Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1300Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1300.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1301Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1310Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1320Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1324Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1325Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code654.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code655.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9272Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1206Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1600.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14043.27Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback