CA AB1772 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 502.95 of the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 502.95 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |