CA AB1772 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2051.5 of the Insurance Code, relating to fire insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Fire insurance: indemnity.
Sponsors
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1772 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1772 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1772 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1772 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1772 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1772 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1772 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1772 Aguiar-Curry et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1772 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6077.). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6003.) |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 6002.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 2051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |