CA AB1770 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1797.123 of, and to add Section 1797.1201 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Ambulance patient offload time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.M. and HEALTH. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.1201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |