CA AB177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 367.8 and 367.9 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 68645, 69951, and 77205 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 50050 of, to add and repeal Sections 68119 and 69950.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 69950 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 1465.9 of, to amend and repeal Sections 1001.15, 1001.16, 1203.1c, 1203.1m, and 1214.5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1001.90, 1202.4, 1203.1, 1203.1ab, 1203.4a, 1203.9, 1205, 2085.5, 2085.6, and 2085.7 of, and to repeal Section 1463.07 of, the Penal Code, and to amend and repeal Section 40508.5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 40510.5 of, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 42240) to Chapter 2 of Division 18 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 177 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB177 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 177 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB177 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 177 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 3057.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3049.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2579.). |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 7). |
2021-09-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2303.) |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2302.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 500.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68645 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 77205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1202.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1214.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1465.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2085.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2085.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2085.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40508.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40510.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |