CA AB1768 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 34340 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The County of San Bernardino: housing authority: middle-income housing projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1768 Steinorth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1768 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4733.).
2018-06-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5166.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code34340Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback