CA AB1765 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6588.7 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Marks-Roos Local Bond Pooling Act of 1985: rate reduction bonds: review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1765 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1765 Nazarian By Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1765 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1765 Nazarian By Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1765 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.) |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4943.). |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4918.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6588.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |