CA AB1765 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 23 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 17053.44 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: credits: qualified disaster area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code27388.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17053.44New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback