CA AB176 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 22 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26003 and 26011.8 of the Public Resources Code, relating to alternative energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Alternative Energy and Advanced Transportation Financing Authority: sales and use taxes: exclusions: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-02-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and REV. & TAX.
2019-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2019-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code26003Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code26011.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback