CA AB1759 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Chapter 1266 of the Statutes of 1970, and to repeal Chapter 625 of the Statutes of 1973, relating to public trust lands, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public trust lands: City of Sacramento.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1759 McCarty et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1759 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5280.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5436.).
2018-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and H. & C.D.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65400.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code2034Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2036.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback