CA AB1757 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38561.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: climate goal: natural and working lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1757 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1757 Cristina Garcia et al. By Becker (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1757 Haney Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1757 Cristina Garcia et al. By Becker (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1757 Haney Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 15.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5401.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4738.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |