CA AB1757 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13024 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: hate crime reporting guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13024 | New Code | See Bill Text |