CA AB1752 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 87482.3 of, and to add Section 87815.5 to, the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: part-time employees.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87482.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87815.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |