CA AB1752 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 31049.1 of the Water Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Coast Water District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1752 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB1752 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1752 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-03 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3534.).
2019-09-12AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 12).
2019-09-11AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3439.)
2019-08-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
2019-08-19SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-12SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2019-06-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-17SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-06-17SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-06-10SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Umberg.
2019-06-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4).
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code31049.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback