CA AB1751 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3212.86, 3212.87, and 3212.88 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: COVID-19: critical workers.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1751 Daly Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1751 Daly By Umberg (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1751 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1751 Daly By Umberg (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1751 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5219.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 10.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |