CA AB1748 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54221 of the Government Code, relating to surplus land.
Title
Exempt surplus land: regional housing need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |