CA AB1747 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15160 of the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
California Law Enforcement Telecommunications System: immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1747 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1747 Gonzalez et al. By Durazo (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1747 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1747 Gonzalez et al. By Durazo (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1747 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 3583.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2936.). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 1632.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |