CA AB1744 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8421 and 8482.3 of, and to add Sections 8429, 8484.66, and 8484.76 to, the Education Code, and to amend Section 34019 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to after school programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

After school programs: substance use prevention: funding: cannabis revenue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1744 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2018-01-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
2018-01-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code8421Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8429New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8482.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8484.66New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8484.76New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34019Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback