CA AB1743 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53340, 65008, and 65589.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: properties eligible to claim or receiving a welfare exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1743 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1743 Bloom By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1743 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1743 Bloom By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1743 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3501.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2858.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 4) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1464.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65589.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |