CA AB1743 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 53340, 65008, and 65589.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: properties eligible to claim or receiving a welfare exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1743 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1743 Bloom By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1743 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3501.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2858.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-04SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 4)
2019-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1464.)
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53340Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65008Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65589.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback