CA AB1742 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1785.11.2 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer credit reporting agencies.
Title
Consumer credit reporting agencies: security freeze requests.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1742 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5124.) |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1785.11.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |