CA AB1740 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to public postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: University of California, Riverside School of Medicine: expansion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback