CA AB1738 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 290 and 290.46 of the Penal Code, relating to sex offenses.
Title
Sex offenses: prostitution: registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration refused. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |