CA AB1737 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11174.32 of the Penal Code, relating to child death investigations.
Title
Child death investigations: review teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11174.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |