CA AB1734 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 175, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 175, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25607 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: licensed premises: retail sales and consumption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1734 Bennett (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1734 Bennett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1734 Bennett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 175, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4715.). |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4658.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |