CA AB1733 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 101.7 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 11122.5, 11123, 11124, 11125, 11125.4, 11128.5, and 11129 of, and to repeal Section 11123.5 of, the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State bodies: open meetings.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and B. & P. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 101.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11122.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11123.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11125.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11128.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |