CA AB1731 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11165.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CURES database: buprenorphine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1731 Santiago By Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - AB 1731 Santiago Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2023.
2023-09-01 Approved by the Governor.
2023-08-29 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2023-08-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-08-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2136.).
2023-06-08SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-06-08SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2023-06-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 5).
2023-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2023-04-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-04-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1181.)
2023-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2023-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2023-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2023-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11165.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback