CA AB1731 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 88600 of the Education Code, relating to apprenticeships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apprenticeships: training funds: audits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1731 J., E.D., & E (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1731 J., E.D. & E. Assembly Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-21 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m.
2017-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1845.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1543.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-04-24Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED.)
2017-04-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1173.)
2017-04-24AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1173.)
2017-04-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and HIGHER ED.
2017-03-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 23.
2017-03-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code88600Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback