CA AB1731 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 236.13 to the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking: Statewide Interagency Human
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1731 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1731 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5088.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 236.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |