CA AB1729 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19817 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gaming.
Title
Gaming Policy Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |