CA AB1726 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8310.7 of the Government Code, relating to data collection.
Title
Data collection.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1726 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1726 Bonta By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1726 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1726 Bonta By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1726 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6360.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5277.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5215.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HEALTH. |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8310.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |