CA AB1725 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8422, 8426, 8426.5, 8428, 8482.55, 8483.7, 8483.75, and 8484.8 of the Education Code, relating to before and after school programs.
Title
Before and after school programs: maximum grant amounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1725 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2104.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8422 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8426 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8426.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8428 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8482.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8483.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8483.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8484.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |