CA AB1724 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 24204 and 25503.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: licenses: suspension and revocation tied-house exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1724 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1724 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1724 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1724 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1724 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3386.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3097.) |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2461.). |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1396.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 16. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 24204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |