CA AB1720 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 123621 and 123622 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to clinics.
Title
Clinics: prenatal screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1720 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1720 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1720 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1720 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1720 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3530.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (September 13). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3436.) |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2718.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1492.) |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123621 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123622 | New Code | See Bill Text |