CA AB1716 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8246 of the Education Code, relating to childcare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family child care home education networks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code8246Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback