CA AB1715 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13997 of, and to add Section 13996.43 to, the Government Code, relating to economic development, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
International trade and investment offices.
Sponsors
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1715 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1715 Quirk-Silva et al. By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1715 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1715 Quirk-Silva et al. By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1715 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6611.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5570.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3860.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9). |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 15. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13996.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13997 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 926.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12283 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18410.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23622.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23657 | Amended Code | Citation Text |