CA AB1714 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 41990) to Chapter 3 of Part 4 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emissions limitations: wine fermentation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1714 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-09-10SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.)
2019-08-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2009.)
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 24. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2019-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code41990New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback