CA AB1712 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12586 of the Government Code, relating to charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Donor-advised funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-01-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-06-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12586Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback