CA AB1711 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 68052.1 to the Education Code, relating to the University of California, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
University of California: nonresident student enrollment.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1711 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1711 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4861.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4861.) (pending re-refer to Com. on APPR.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 2. Page 5087.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration granted. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68052.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |