CA AB1710 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 394 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to service members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited discrimination against service members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1710 V. A. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1710 V.A. (Irwin) By Newman (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1710 V.A (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1710 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3362.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2741.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-07SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-07SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-07SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2017-08-28SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2017-08-28AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2017-08-28AssemblyWithdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2230.).
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1620.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
2017-03-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 6.
2017-03-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code394Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback