CA AB171 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 12 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 230 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: sexual harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 171 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-06-26SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 5. Page 1919.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2019-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
2019-01-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code230Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback