CA AB1709 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8588.16 to the Government Code, and to add Section 17053.20 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Income taxation: credits: blood donations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and E.M. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8588.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |