CA AB1709 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 835a of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement: use of force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1709 Jones-Sawyer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2020-07-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-29SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-29SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1773.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code835Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback