CA AB1708 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1714.27 to the Civil Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 19305) to Part 3 of Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency response.
Title
Emergency response: trauma kits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1714.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 19305 | New Code | See Bill Text |