CA AB1707 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16180 of the Government Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Property tax postponement: Senior Citizens and Disabled Citizens Property Tax Postponement Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Boerner Horvath By Caballero (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1707 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1707 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4900.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4828.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |