CA AB1707 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2302 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Polling places: handheld devices.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Berman By McGuire (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1707 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1707 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2853.). |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 1573.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2302 | New Code | See Bill Text |