CA AB1701 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 218.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor-related liabilities: original contractor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1701 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1701 Thurmond et al. By Bradford (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1701 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-14 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3334.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2505.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 18).
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-01SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 1480.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 3).
2017-05-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2017-02-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code212Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code218.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback