CA AB1699 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2898 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: mobile internet service providers: first response agencies: emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1699 Levine Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 Levine By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1699 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3272.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2709.).
2019-09-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-27SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1572.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2898New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback