CA AB1699 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 132, 134, 705, 705.1, 709.5, 714, 717.5, 742.39, 857, 859, 881, 882, 884, 900.5, 924, 949, 1011.5, 1076, 1091, 1101, 1104.9, 1107.1, 1113, 1140.5, 1192.8, 1194.85, 1215.2, 1215.5, 1401.5, 1589, 1590, 1599, 1601, 1750, 1751, 1751.1, 1751.3, 1751.6, 1755, 1757.2, 1758.62, 1758.7, 1758.81, 1758.92, 1765, 1765.2, 1781.3, 1811, 1842, 4030, 4060, 4093, 5051, 7015.5, 7042, 7045, 9098, 10113.2, 10479.5, 10493, 10506.1, 10506.2, 10507.1, 11019, 11090, 11401, 11520.5, 11620, 11691, 11751, 11751.25, 12105, 12161, 12162, 12166, 12168, 12280.2, 12389, 12416, 12418.1, 12418.3, 12640.10, 12815, 12972, 12973.5, 12973.6, 12975, 12978, 14042, and 14097 of, and to repeal and add Section 12973 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: fees and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1699 Insurance Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 INS. (Daly) By Mendoza (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1699 INS. Assembly Third Reading By DALY (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 INS. (Daly) By Mendoza (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1699 INS. Assembly Third Reading By DALY (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3328.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2772.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2047.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1059.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |