CA AB1696 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8002, 8002.5, 9083.5, 13206, and 13206.5 of, and to add Section 13321 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: nonpartisan candidates’ party preference.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13206.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13321 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 8002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8002.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9083.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |